This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 16:45:00 (UTC).

STATE VS RICHARDSON WALLACE D

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RICHARDSON WALLACE D. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS JAMES BROWN and RHONDA E. BABB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

RHONDA E. BABB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

RICHARDSON WALLACE DENZEL

Melbourne, FL 32901-7055

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR REMISSION OF FORFEITURE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

06/02/2020: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR REMISSION OF FORFEITURE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

05/28/2020: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

CLERKS REMISSION CHECKLIST AND ADVISEMENT FOR REMISSION OF FORFEITURE

05/20/2020: CLERKS REMISSION CHECKLIST AND ADVISEMENT FOR REMISSION OF FORFEITURE

MOTION FOR REMISSION OF FORFEITURE

05/13/2020: MOTION FOR REMISSION OF FORFEITURE

CLERKS RECEIPT SATISFACTION REGARDING BOND FORFEITURE RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

04/23/2020: CLERKS RECEIPT SATISFACTION REGARDING BOND FORFEITURE RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

FORFEITURE OF BAIL BOND RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

02/24/2020: FORFEITURE OF BAIL BOND RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

BENCH WARRANT

02/24/2020: BENCH WARRANT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

02/24/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

02/18/2020: RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

INFORMATION

02/09/2020: INFORMATION

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/06/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

02/03/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

01/31/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

01/31/2020: COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

01/31/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketDSB: BOND REDISBURSEMENT; Amount: 500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 7; Control Number: 286671; Transaction Type: BOND REFUND; Transaction Amount: $0.00; Transaction Balance: $500.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: PAID FORFEITURE; Payee Name: MONCRIEF BAIL BONDS INC; Payee Address1: 3910 S JOHN YOUNG PKWY; Payee City State Zip: ORLANDO FL 328399209; Check Amount: $500.00; Check Date: 06/15/2020; Check Number: 823189

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 7; Control Number: 286671; Transaction Type: BOND REFUND; Transaction Amount: $0.00; Transaction Balance: $500.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: PAID FORFEITURE; Payee Name: MONCRIEF BAIL BONDS INC; Payee Address1: 3910 S JOHN YOUNG PKWY; Payee City State Zip: ORLANDO FL 328399209; Check Amount: $500.00; Check Date: 06/15/2020; Check Number: 823189

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 6; Transaction Type: POST BOND/DEPOSIT; Transaction Amount: $0.00; Transaction Balance: $500.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: T 785045; Check Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 6; Transaction Type: POST BOND/DEPOSIT; Transaction Amount: $0.00; Transaction Balance: $500.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: T 785045; Check Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: T785045; Party: D 1; Event Description: PMT: BOND REMISS/SET ASIDE; Amount: $500.00; Payment Type: CASH BOND; Received From: BREVARD COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR REMISSION OF FORFEITURE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CLERKS REMISSION CHECKLIST AND ADVISEMENT FOR REMISSION OF FORFEITURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION FOR REMISSION OF FORFEITURE

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 856.021; Charge Description: LOITERING OR PROWLING; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • BondBonds: Bond Id: 645495; Count Id: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Number: U520757247; Amount: $500.00; Status: PAID FORFEITURE; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • BondBonds: Bond Id: 645495; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Number: U520757247; Amount: $500.00; Status: PAID FORFEITURE; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketBOND POSTED- (Count 1); Amount: 500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less