This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/17/2020 at 08:01:11 (UTC).

STATE VS REINERTZ DAVID C

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against REINERTZ DAVID C. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are NANCY MALONEY, THOMAS JAMES BROWN, JUDITH E ATKIN and KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

NANCY MALONEY

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

JUDITH E ATKIN

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

REINERTZ DAVID CHRISTIAN

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-2042

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

CONOMOS CHRISTOPHER W

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Ste E

Melbourne, FL 32940-6698

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

02/18/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

02/18/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

02/18/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

SCORESHEET

02/18/2020: SCORESHEET

ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN AS PREVIOUSLY SET

01/17/2020: ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN AS PREVIOUSLY SET

COURT MINUTES REGARDING VETERANS COURT STATUS HEARING

01/17/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING VETERANS COURT STATUS HEARING

COURT MINUTES REGARDING BOND HEARING

01/13/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING BOND HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/10/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/07/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

INTERIM ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND STATES DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS INTENTION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

12/30/2019: INTERIM ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND STATES DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS INTENTION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

12/13/2019: RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/02/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

11/25/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

11/25/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

11/25/2019: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

11/25/2019: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

11/25/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

11/25/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CIR; Amount Assessed: $200.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CIR; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE CIR; Amount Assessed: $100.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PUB DEF/APPT CNSL CI; Amount Assessed: $100.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TR CIR; Amount Assessed: $25.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CIR RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CIR CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COI BREV SHERIFF CIR; Amount Assessed: $99.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $99.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PREP & RECORD SAT CI; Amount Assessed: $25.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $25.50

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER CRIMES AGAINST PERSON; Judge: NANCY MALONEY; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.09.2.C; Charge Description: ARMED TRESPASS PROPERTY NOT STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANC; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Disposition Date: 02/18/2020; Final Disposition: ADJUDICATION WITHHELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.09.2.C; Charge Description: ARMED TRESPASS PROPERTY NOT STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANC; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less