This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/09/2020 at 09:08:11 (UTC).

STATE VS PIERSON SHERRIE LYNNE

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PIERSON SHERRIE LYNNE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are NANCY MALONEY, THOMAS JAMES BROWN, JUDITH E ATKIN, KELLY INGRAM and RHONDA E. BABB. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

NANCY MALONEY

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

JUDITH E ATKIN

KELLY INGRAM

RHONDA E. BABB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

PIERSON SHERRIE LYNNE

Titusville, FL 32780-9999

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

HIR BAILEY ALEXA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Melbourne, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

03/02/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

03/02/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

COURT MINUTES REGARDING PLEA

03/02/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING PLEA

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/18/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

02/18/2020: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

02/18/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/07/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

01/07/2020: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

ORDER REVOKING BOND

12/17/2019: ORDER REVOKING BOND

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/13/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

INFORMATION

12/03/2019: INFORMATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/02/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

11/25/2019: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

11/25/2019: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

11/25/2019: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

11/25/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

11/25/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

11/25/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2030
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2030
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CIR; Amount Assessed: $200.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2030
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CIR; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2030
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE CIR; Amount Assessed: $100.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2030
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PUB DEF/APPT CNSL CI; Amount Assessed: $100.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2030
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: RESTITUTION; Amount Assessed: $24.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $24.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2030
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TR CIR; Amount Assessed: $25.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2030
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CIR RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2030
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CIR CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2030
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COI BREV SHERIFF CIR; Amount Assessed: $178.04; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $178.04

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: THEFT FORGERY FRAUD; Judge: NANCY MALONEY; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.3C; Charge Description: FELONY PETIT THEFT 2 OR MORE PRIOR THEFT CONVICTNS; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Disposition Date: 03/02/2020; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.3C; Charge Description: FELONY PETIT THEFT 2 OR MORE PRIOR THEFT CONVICTNS; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less