This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/19/2020 at 06:20:36 (UTC).

STATE VS OSBOURNE DYMOND P M

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against OSBOURNE DYMOND P M. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

OSBOURNE DYMOND PATRICIA

Palm Bay, FL 32905-3825

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED

01/06/2020: CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED

COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

11/25/2019: COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

11/25/2019: PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

11/25/2019: INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

SWORN COMPLAINT (SOUTH JURISDICTION)

11/25/2019: SWORN COMPLAINT (SOUTH JURISDICTION)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCR/TR SUMMONS UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.2E; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT PROP OVER 100 LESS THAN 300; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • WarrantWarrants/Writs: Name: OSBOURNE DYMOND PATRICIA; Role: PARTY; Writ Number: 1688907; Writ Type: CRIMINAL SUMMONS; Amount: $0.00; Date Served: 01/02/2020; Issued To: ISSUED TO BREVARD CO SHERIFF; Type of Service: PERSONAL SERVICE; Service: UNSERVED; Unserved Reason: UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCR/TR SUMMONS ISSD TO SHERIFF; Amount: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SWORN COMPLAINT (SOUTH JURISDICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.2E; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT PROP OVER 100 LESS THAN 300; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.2E; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT PROP OVER 100 LESS THAN 300; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less