This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/09/2020 at 09:09:10 (UTC).

STATE VS NICHOLSON LATOYA R

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against NICHOLSON LATOYA R. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are NANCY MALONEY, JUDITH E ATKIN and THOMAS JAMES BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

NANCY MALONEY

JUDITH E ATKIN

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

NICHOLSON LATOYA RENEE DOC Number - E60167

Palm Bay, FL 32908-1415

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

WISOKER STEVEN

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way

Viera, FL 32940-

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

01/16/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

01/16/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

01/16/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

SCORESHEET

01/16/2020: SCORESHEET

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

01/16/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

INTERIM ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND STATES DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS INTENTION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

01/15/2020: INTERIM ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND STATES DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS INTENTION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

12/18/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

INFORMATION

12/18/2019: INFORMATION

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

12/03/2019: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/02/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

11/26/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

11/26/2019: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

11/26/2019: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

11/26/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

11/26/2019: ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

11/26/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

11/26/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

11/25/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: DOM VIO TF W/CLK CIR; Amount Assessed: $86.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $86.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CIR; Amount Assessed: $200.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CIR; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE CIR; Amount Assessed: $100.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PUB DEF/APPT CNSL CI; Amount Assessed: $100.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TR CIR; Amount Assessed: $25.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CIR RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CIR CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COI BREV SHERIFF CIR; Amount Assessed: $123.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $123.00

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCAL:ADD-ON INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCR: INITIAL APP CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.07.1C; Charge Description: BATTERY ON EMERGENCY MEDICAL CARE PROVIDER; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Disposition Date: 01/16/2020; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.07.2.B; Charge Description: BATTERY OF LEO OR FIREFIGHTER; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER CRIMES AGAINST PERSON; Judge: NANCY MALONEY; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less