This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/17/2022 at 11:20:27 (UTC).

STATE VS MUMPOWER JACOB MORGAN

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MUMPOWER JACOB MORGAN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KATHRYN C JACOBUS and RHONDA E. BABB. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KATHRYN C JACOBUS

RHONDA E. BABB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

MUMPOWER JACOB MORGAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

GOLUB GEOFFREY

512 N Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32935-6838

 

Court Documents

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

05/06/2022: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

05/06/2022: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

05/06/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

05/06/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

05/06/2022: PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

05/11/2022: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/11/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

05/19/2022: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: KATHRYN C JACOBUS; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Docket(#7) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 18-21-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:15 PM; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Matter Type: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Result: CR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2022
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.03.1.A.1; Charge Description: BATTERY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SETTING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: KATHRYN C JACOBUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant