This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/09/2020 at 09:08:01 (UTC).

STATE VS MORRIS MARY ANNE

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MORRIS MARY ANNE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RHONDA E. BABB. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RHONDA E. BABB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

MORRIS MARY ANNE

Cocoa, FL 32926-5181

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

AMENDED ORDER FOR FINE, COSTS, AND FEES

03/09/2020: AMENDED ORDER FOR FINE, COSTS, AND FEES

AMENDED JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

03/09/2020: AMENDED JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

AMENDED MINUTES

03/09/2020: AMENDED MINUTES

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

03/05/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

03/05/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

03/05/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

02/25/2020: RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

02/12/2020: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/12/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

02/12/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

02/12/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

01/17/2020: CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

01/03/2020: COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

01/03/2020: PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED

12/17/2019: CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED

COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

11/25/2019: COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

11/25/2019: INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

SWORN COMPLAINT (CENTRAL JURISDICTION)

11/25/2019: SWORN COMPLAINT (CENTRAL JURISDICTION)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PUB DEF/APPT CNSL CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: RESTITUTION; Amount Assessed: $224.75; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $224.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TF CO; Amount Assessed: $10.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CO RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COI BREV SHERIFF CO; Amount Assessed: $168.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $168.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CTY CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCR/TR SUMMONS UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.2E; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT PROP OVER 100 LESS THAN 300; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • WarrantWarrants/Writs: Name: MORRIS MARY; Role: PARTY; Writ Number: 1688904; Writ Type: CRIMINAL SUMMONS; Amount: $0.00; Date Served: 12/16/2019; Issued To: ISSUED TO BREVARD CO SHERIFF; Type of Service: PERSONAL SERVICE; Service: UNSERVED; Unserved Reason: UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCR/TR SUMMONS ISSD TO SHERIFF; Amount: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SWORN COMPLAINT (CENTRAL JURISDICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.2E; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT PROP OVER 100 LESS THAN 300; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 03/05/2020; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.2E; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT PROP OVER 100 LESS THAN 300; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less