This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/06/2020 at 11:35:59 (UTC).

STATE VS MORE PATRICK RYAN

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MORE PATRICK RYAN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KELLY JO MCKIBBEN, DAVID C KOENIG and RHONDA E. BABB. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KELLY JO MCKIBBEN

DAVID C KOENIG

RHONDA E. BABB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

MORE PATRICK RYAN

Titusville, FL 32780-9999

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

WEINSTOCK ANDREW JORDAN

Po Box 411443

Melbourne, FL 32941-1443

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL 5TH

7165 Murrell Rd Ste 101

Melbourne, FL 32940-8261

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

03/05/2020: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

02/25/2020: PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

COURT MINUTES REGARDING BOND HEARING

02/24/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING BOND HEARING

RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

02/18/2020: RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/13/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

02/12/2020: ORDER APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

ORDER RELIEVING ATTORNEY FROM REPRESENTATION

02/11/2020: ORDER RELIEVING ATTORNEY FROM REPRESENTATION

ORDER APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

02/11/2020: ORDER APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

COURT MINUTES REGARDING HEARING

02/11/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING HEARING

ORDER RELIEVING ATTORNEY FROM REPRESENTATION

02/11/2020: ORDER RELIEVING ATTORNEY FROM REPRESENTATION

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/07/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

02/05/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/31/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

01/31/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

01/31/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

01/31/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

01/31/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

01/31/2020: COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketWAV: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: DAVID C KOENIG; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:30 AM; Judge: KELLY JO MCKIBBEN; Matter Type: BOND HEARING; Result: CR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docket(#27) ORDER SETTING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) COURT MINUTES REGARDING BOND HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: BURGLARY; Judge: KELLY JO MCKIBBEN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less