This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 08:02:59 (UTC).

STATE VS MORAGNE ERNEST LEE

Case Summary

On 02/22/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MORAGNE ERNEST LEE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU, KENNETH FRIEDLAND and LISA DAVIDSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

LISA DAVIDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

MORAGNE ERNEST LEE

Merritt Island, FL 32953-5531

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/22/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

02/22/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

02/22/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

02/22/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

02/22/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

COPY OF CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

02/22/2020: COPY OF CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

02/22/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

02/22/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 08:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:ARRAIGNMENT; Court Room Description: TITUSVILLE HISTORIC COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; User: mmk65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: LISA DAVIDSON; Matter Type: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Result: CR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COPY OF CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER CRIMES AGAINST PERSON; Judge: TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 316.193.1; Charge Description: DRIVING UNDER THE INFLUENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Citation Number: 2020A0A3EJE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 316.1935.2-A; Charge Description: FLEE OR ATT TO ELUDE LEO LIGHT SIRENS ON PURSUIT; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 316.193.1; Charge Description: DRIVING UNDER THE INFLUENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 316.1935.2-A; Charge Description: FLEE OR ATT TO ELUDE LEO LIGHT SIRENS ON PURSUIT; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCitations: Agency: BREVARD COUNTY SHERIFF; Officer: PATTERSON TYLER- Badge 4028; Citation Number: 2020A0A3EJE; Vehicle State: FL; Vehicle License: IUIR17; Body Type: 4 DOOR; Make: MAZD; Color: WH; Year: 2010

    Read MoreRead Less