This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/20/2020 at 10:22:52 (UTC).

STATE VS MICHAUX KEITH D JR

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MICHAUX KEITH D JR. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KELLY JO MCKIBBEN, RHONDA E. BABB and JUDITH E ATKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KELLY JO MCKIBBEN

RHONDA E. BABB

JUDITH E ATKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

CITY OF COCOA POLICE DEPARTMENT

1226 W King St

Cocoa, FL 32922

Defendants

MICHAUX KEITH DOUGLAS DOC Number - E31048

Cocoa, FL 32922

MICHAUX KEITH DOUGLAS JR DOC Number - E31048

Cocoa, FL 32922

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

FUNK KEPLER B

3962 W Eau Gallie Blvd Ste B

Melbourne, FL 32934-3294

DIAMOND ALAN S

3962 W Eau Gallie Blvd Ste B

Melbourne, FL 32934-3294

SZACHACZ KEITH F

3962 W Eau Gallie Blvd Ste B

Melbourne, FL 32934-3294

 

Court Documents

WITNESS LIST

01/22/2020: WITNESS LIST

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

04/27/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/17/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER SETTING HEARING

04/17/2020: ORDER SETTING HEARING

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

02/12/2020: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

02/07/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

01/28/2020: RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

MOTION REGARDING FINGERPRINTS

01/27/2020: MOTION REGARDING FINGERPRINTS

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

12/10/2019: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/06/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

11/22/2019: SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

11/22/2019: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/21/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

AMENDED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

11/18/2019: AMENDED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

11/18/2019: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

11/18/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

AMENDED MINUTES

11/18/2019: AMENDED MINUTES

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

11/18/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 08:30 AM; Event Description: CAL:HEARING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: KELLY JO MCKIBBEN; User: rks66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 01:30 PM; Event Description: CAL:DOCKET SOUNDING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: KELLY JO MCKIBBEN; User: tjf57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:15 PM; Judge: KELLY JO MCKIBBEN; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Docket(#4) ORDER ESTABLISHING ELECTRONIC MONITORING CONDITIONS, COSTS WAIVED, DEFENDANT INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER CRIMES AGAINST PERSON; Judge: KELLY JO MCKIBBEN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 784.03-C; Charge Description: BATTERY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 12/30/2019; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.03.2-A; Charge Description: FELONY BATTERY BY SECOND OR SUBSEQUENT OFFENSE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less