Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/01/2020 at 00:12:17 (UTC).

STATE VS MERTYL LEONARDO

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MERTYL LEONARDO. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KELLY JO MCKIBBEN, KELLY INGRAM, JUDITH E ATKIN, DAVID C KOENIG, RHONDA E. BABB and KATHRYN C JACOBUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KELLY JO MCKIBBEN

KELLY INGRAM

JUDITH E ATKIN

DAVID C KOENIG

RHONDA E. BABB

KATHRYN C JACOBUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

PALM BAY POLICE DEPT

Defendant

MERTYL LEONARDO

Palm Bay, FL 32905-3750

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

MOENCKMEIER HEIKO G

836 Highland Ave

Orlando, FL 32803-3941

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

06/11/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

06/11/2020: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

06/11/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

INTERIM ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND STATES DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS INTENTION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

04/14/2020: INTERIM ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND STATES DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS INTENTION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

02/13/2020: MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

03/20/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

02/13/2020: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/13/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

02/03/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/04/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SURETY BOND- (Count 6)

02/03/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 6)

SURETY BOND- (Count 5)

02/03/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 5)

SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

02/03/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

02/01/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

02/01/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

02/01/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

02/01/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

01/31/2020: COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 08:30 AM; Event Description: CAL:EARLY RESOLUTION; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: KATHRYN C JACOBUS; User: pds74

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCAL:EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:30 AM; Judge: DAVID C KOENIG; Matter Type: EARLY RESOLUTION; Result: CR: EARLY RESOLUTION CONT CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCR: EARLY RESOLUTION CONT CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCAL:EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Matter Type: EARLY RESOLUTION; Result: CR: EARLY RESOLUTION CONT DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 4; Florida Statute: 893.147.1-A; Charge Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A-AQ; Charge Description: POSS OF MORE THAN 20 GRAMS OF CANNABIS; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 790.23.1-C; Charge Description: POSS OF A FIREARM OR AMMO BY A FLORIDA DELINQUENT; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 790.23.1-C; Charge Description: POSS OF A FIREARM OR AMMO BY A FLORIDA DELINQUENT; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SEARCH WARRANT RETURN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SEARCH WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DRUGS; Judge: KELLY JO MCKIBBEN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 790.23.1-C; Charge Description: POSS OF A FIREARM OR AMMO BY A FLORIDA DELINQUENT; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Disposition Date: 03/20/2020; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less