This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/25/2020 at 11:21:30 (UTC).

STATE VS LOWE SHAUN DAVID

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LOWE SHAUN DAVID. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBIN C LEMONIDIS, KELLY INGRAM and DAVID C KOENIG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBIN C LEMONIDIS

KELLY INGRAM

DAVID C KOENIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

LOWE SHAUN DAVID DOC Number - E22056

Melbourne, FL 32935-4518

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

02/28/2020: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

02/06/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/04/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER SETTING BOND

02/01/2020: ORDER SETTING BOND

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/01/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

02/01/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

02/01/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

02/01/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

02/01/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

02/01/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

01/31/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: DAVID C KOENIG; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketWAV: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $50.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Matter Type: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Result: CR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 951.22.1; Charge Description: CONSP INTRODUCE CONTRABAND INTO DETENTION FACILITY; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Disposition Date: 02/28/2020; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 951.22.1; Charge Description: CONSP INTRODUCE CONTRABAND INTO DETENTION FACILITY; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER; Judge: ROBIN C LEMONIDIS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less