This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 10:03:32 (UTC).

STATE VS LOPEZ-GABALWDON D L

Case Summary

On 09/26/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LOPEZ-GABALWDON D L. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID C KOENIG and AARON J PEACOCK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVID C KOENIG

AARON J PEACOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

LOPEZ-GABALDON DANIELLE LEIGH

Palm Bay, FL 32905-2734

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

09/27/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

09/27/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

09/27/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

09/27/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

09/28/2020: PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

09/27/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

09/26/2020: COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

09/26/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 01:30 PM; Event Description: CAL:ARRAIGNMENT; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: DAVID C KOENIG; User: mmk65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 18-21-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: AARON J PEACOCK; Matter Type: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Result: CR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CO- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.03.1.A.1; Charge Description: BATTERY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.03.1.A.1; Charge Description: BATTERY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: DAVID C KOENIG; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less