This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/27/2020 at 00:07:25 (UTC).

STATE VS LOFTON WILLIE ROYAL

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LOFTON WILLIE ROYAL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBIN C LEMONIDIS, THOMAS JAMES BROWN and JAMES H EARP. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBIN C LEMONIDIS

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

JAMES H EARP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

LOFTON WILLIE ROYAL

Cocoa, FL 32922-6743

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL 5TH

7165 Murrell Rd Ste 101

Melbourne, FL 32940-8261

PEAT MELISSA E

1819 Riverview Dr Ste 101

Melbourne, FL 32901-4794

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

03/25/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

02/21/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

ORDER AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF COSTS

02/06/2020: ORDER AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF COSTS

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY

01/29/2020: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY

ORDER APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

01/27/2020: ORDER APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

ORDER RELIEVING ATTORNEY FROM REPRESENTATION

01/17/2020: ORDER RELIEVING ATTORNEY FROM REPRESENTATION

ORDER APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

01/17/2020: ORDER APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

01/17/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

SERVED CAPIAS

12/28/2019: SERVED CAPIAS

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

12/03/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

12/03/2019: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

11/12/2019: RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

10/30/2019: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

10/30/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

10/30/2019: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

10/30/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

10/30/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

CAPIAS

10/29/2019: CAPIAS

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 01:15 PM; Event Description: CAL:DOCKET SOUNDING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: ROBIN C LEMONIDIS; User: caf90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:30 AM; Judge: ROBIN C LEMONIDIS; Matter Type: DOCKET SOUNDING; Result: CR: DCKT SNDNG CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCR: DCKT SNDNG CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:30 AM; Judge: ROBIN C LEMONIDIS; Matter Type: DOCKET SOUNDING; Result: CR: DCKT SNDNG CONT BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 812.014.3C; Charge Description: FELONY PETIT THEFT 2 OR MORE PRIOR THEFT CONVICTNS; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Disposition Date: 10/28/2019; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 810.02.4.B-D; Charge Description: BURGLARY OF A CONVEYANCE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 817.61-A; Charge Description: FRAUDULENT USE OF CREDIT CARDS 100 DOLLARS OR MORE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Disposition Date: 10/28/2019; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 7; Florida Statute: 812.014.2.C.1; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 GRAND THEFT OVER 300 LESS THAN 5000 DOLS; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 6; Florida Statute: 810.02.3-A; Charge Description: BURGLARY OF DWELLING OR OCCUPIED STRUCTURE; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 5; Florida Statute: 806.13.1.B.2-B; Charge Description: CRIMINAL MISCHIEF OVER 200 LESS THAN 1000 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 4; Florida Statute: 812.014.3C; Charge Description: FELONY PETIT THEFT 2 OR MORE PRIOR THEFT CONVICTNS; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 812.014.3C; Charge Description: FELONY PETIT THEFT 2 OR MORE PRIOR THEFT CONVICTNS; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 810.02.4.B-D; Charge Description: BURGLARY OF A CONVEYANCE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 817.61-A; Charge Description: FRAUDULENT USE OF CREDIT CARDS 100 DOLLARS OR MORE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less