Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/12/2021 at 11:10:45 (UTC).

STATE VS KISSICK AMANDA JEAN

Case Summary

On 02/21/2021 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KISSICK AMANDA JEAN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CHARLES G CRAWFORD, RHONDA E. BABB and KATHRYN C JACOBUS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CHARLES G CRAWFORD

RHONDA E. BABB

KATHRYN C JACOBUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

KISSICK AMANDA JEAN

Vero Beach, FL 32962-8034

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

METCALF ANDREW B

P O Box 2618

Vero Beach, FL 32961-2618

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

03/11/2021: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

03/09/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

03/08/2021: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/08/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

03/02/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

02/23/2021: SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

02/22/2021: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

02/21/2021: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: KATHRYN C JACOBUS; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE ISSD- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:15 PM; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Matter Type: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Result: CR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A; Charge Description: POSSESS OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE W OUT PRESCRIPTION; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Disposition Date: 03/11/2021; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A; Charge Description: POSSESS OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE W OUT PRESCRIPTION; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • BondBonds: Bond Id: 666249; Count Id: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Number: FCS102199580; Amount: $3,000.00; Status: RELEASED; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • DocketBOND POSTED- (Count 1); Amount: 3000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DRUGS; Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant