This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/02/2020 at 06:21:52 (UTC).

STATE VS KENNY JOSHUA DAVID

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KENNY JOSHUA DAVID. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KATHRYN C JACOBUS and MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KATHRYN C JACOBUS

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

KENNY JOSHUA DAVID

Cape Canaveral, FL 32920-2400

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

04/09/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

03/24/2020: RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

02/17/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

ORDER SETTING BOND

02/13/2020: ORDER SETTING BOND

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

02/13/2020: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/13/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

02/13/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

02/13/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

02/13/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

SERVED CAPIAS

02/13/2020: SERVED CAPIAS

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

02/13/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

CAPIAS

02/07/2020: CAPIAS

MOTION FOR CAPIAS

01/23/2020: MOTION FOR CAPIAS

CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED

01/03/2020: CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED

COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

11/25/2019: COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

11/25/2019: PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

11/25/2019: INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

SWORN COMPLAINT (CENTRAL JURISDICTION)

11/25/2019: SWORN COMPLAINT (CENTRAL JURISDICTION)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 08:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:DOCKET SOUNDING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: KATHRYN C JACOBUS; User: jnl75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: KATHRYN C JACOBUS; Matter Type: DOCKET SOUNDING; Result: CR: DCKT SNDNG CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketCR: DCKT SNDNG CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 1; Transaction Type: RECORD ORDER/CREATE BOND; Transaction Amount: $1,500.00; Transaction Balance: $0.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: OPEN; Check Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCR/TR SUMMONS UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.08.1; Charge Description: TRESPASS IN STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • WarrantWarrants/Writs: Name: KENNY JOSHUA; Role: PARTY; Writ Number: 1688910; Writ Type: CRIMINAL SUMMONS; Amount: $0.00; Date Served: 12/31/2019; Issued To: ISSUED TO BREVARD CO SHERIFF; Type of Service: PERSONAL SERVICE; Service: UNSERVED; Unserved Reason: UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCR/TR SUMMONS ISSD TO SHERIFF; Amount: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SWORN COMPLAINT (CENTRAL JURISDICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.08.1; Charge Description: TRESPASS IN STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.08.2.B; Charge Description: TRESPASS IN OCCUPIED STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less