This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 10/24/2020 at 11:03:38 (UTC).

STATE VS KEENE DAVID HUEHULANI

Case Summary

On 09/26/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KEENE DAVID HUEHULANI. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KELLY INGRAM and AARON J PEACOCK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KELLY INGRAM

AARON J PEACOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

KEENE DAVID HUEHULANI

Indialantic, FL 32903-4217

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorneys

CANINA RICHARD ALLEN

1901 S Harbor City Blvd Ste 804

Melbourne, FL 32901-4773

ROBERSON LAUREN CANINA

1901 S Harbor City Blvd Ste 804

Melbourne, FL 32901-4773

CANINA RICHARD G

1901 S Harbor City Blvd Ste 804

Melbourne, FL 32901-4773

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/15/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR BOND MODIFICATION

10/14/2020: MOTION FOR BOND MODIFICATION

ORDER SETTING HEARING

10/08/2020: ORDER SETTING HEARING

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

09/29/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/29/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

09/27/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

09/27/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

09/28/2020: PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

09/27/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

09/26/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 09:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:DOCKET SOUNDING; Court Room Description: MELBOURNE COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: KELLY INGRAM; User: skb69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 01:30 PM; Event Description: CAL:BOND HEARING; Court Room Description: MELBOURNE COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: KELLY INGRAM; User: lwl62

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCAL:BOND HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION FOR BOND MODIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2020
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SETTING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.03.1.A.2; Charge Description: BATTERY CAUSE BODILY HARM; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.03.1.A.2; Charge Description: BATTERY CAUSE BODILY HARM; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less