This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/16/2020 at 06:42:20 (UTC).

STATE VS KAYYALI MARK MOHD

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KAYYALI MARK MOHD. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

KAYYALI MARK MOHD

Melbourne, FL 32901-7065

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

01/29/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

01/29/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

01/29/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

01/28/2020: RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

01/21/2020: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/21/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

01/21/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

01/21/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

01/21/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/19/2019: CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

11/26/2019: COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

11/25/2019: PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

11/25/2019: INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

SWORN COMPLAINT (SOUTH JURISDICTION)

11/25/2019: SWORN COMPLAINT (SOUTH JURISDICTION)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PUB DEF/APPT CNSL CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: RESTITUTION; Amount Assessed: $184.12; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $184.12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TF CO; Amount Assessed: $10.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CO RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CTY CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PREP & RECORD SAT CO; Amount Assessed: $25.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $25.50

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SWORN COMPLAINT (SOUTH JURISDICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.3.A; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT LESS THAN 300 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 4; Florida Statute: 812.014.3.A; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT LESS THAN 300 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Disposition Date: 01/29/2020; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 4; Florida Statute: 812.014.3.A; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT LESS THAN 300 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 812.014.3.A; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT LESS THAN 300 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Disposition Date: 01/29/2020; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 812.014.3.A; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT LESS THAN 300 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 812.014.3.A; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT LESS THAN 300 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Disposition Date: 01/29/2020; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 812.014.3.A; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT LESS THAN 300 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.3.A; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT LESS THAN 300 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Disposition Date: 01/29/2020; Final Disposition: ADJUDICATION WITHHELD

    Read MoreRead Less