This case was last updated from Brevard County - Eighteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/11/2022 at 11:13:02 (UTC).

STATE VS JUSTICE KAITLYN L

Case Summary

On 09/24/2022 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JUSTICE KAITLYN L. This case was filed in Brevard County - Eighteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU and MORGAN LAUR REINMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU

MORGAN LAUR REINMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

JUSTICE KAITLYN LOUISE

Mims, FL 32754-4615

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

WARRANT FOR ARREST

09/24/2022: WARRANT FOR ARREST

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

09/24/2022: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

09/25/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

09/25/2022: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

09/25/2022: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

09/25/2022: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

09/25/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

SERVED ARREST WARRANT- (Count 1)

09/26/2022: SERVED ARREST WARRANT- (Count 1)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/27/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

09/29/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

10/03/2022: SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

10/03/2022: SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 1; Transaction Type: RECORD ORDER/CREATE BOND; Transaction Amount: $2,000.00; Transaction Balance: $0.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: OPEN; Check Amount: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 1; Transaction Type: RECORD ORDER/CREATE BOND; Transaction Amount: $2,000.00; Transaction Balance: $0.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: OPEN; Check Amount: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • Docket(#13) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 18-21-B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2022
  • BondBonds: Bond Id: 699354; Count Id: 2; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Number: U521441080; Amount: $2,000.00; Status: OPEN; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2022
  • BondBonds: Bond Id: 699353; Count Id: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Number: U521441079; Amount: $2,000.00; Status: OPEN; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2022
  • DocketARREST WARRANT SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2022
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSD TO SHERIFF; Amount: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WARRANT FOR ARREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2022
  • Docket(#1) AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ARREST WARRANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: BURGLARY; Judge: TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2022
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 812.014.3C; Charge Description: FELONY PETIT THEFT 2 OR MORE PRIOR THEFT CONVICTNS; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2022
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.02.4.A; Charge Description: BURGLARY OF A STRUCTURE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2022
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 812.014.3C; Charge Description: FELONY PETIT THEFT 2 OR MORE PRIOR THEFT CONVICTNS; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2022
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.02.4.A; Charge Description: BURGLARY OF A STRUCTURE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant