This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/22/2020 at 00:04:42 (UTC).

STATE VS JOHNS ASHLEY MARIE

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JOHNS ASHLEY MARIE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KELLY INGRAM, TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU and KENNETH FRIEDLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KELLY INGRAM

TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

JOHNS ASHLEY MARIE

Titusville, FL 32780-9148

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

08/20/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

07/23/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

06/18/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

06/18/2020: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

03/19/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

03/19/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

02/04/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

02/04/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

02/05/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/04/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/01/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

02/01/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

02/01/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

02/01/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

02/01/2020: ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

02/01/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

02/01/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

01/31/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 08:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:EARLY RESOLUTION; Court Room Description: TITUSVILLE HISTORIC COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; User: tth69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCAL:EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Matter Type: EARLY RESOLUTION; Result: CR: EARLY RESOLUTION CONT DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCR: EARLY RESOLUTION CONT DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCAL:EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Matter Type: EARLY RESOLUTION; Result: CR: EARLY RESOLUTION CONT DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF OFFENDER BASED TRANSACTION SYSTEM (OBTS) NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 918.13; Charge Description: TAMPERING OR FABRICATING WITH PHYSICAL EVIDENC; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.147.1-B; Charge Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 843.02-C; Charge Description: RESISTING OFFICER OBSTRUCT WITHOUT VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 918.13; Charge Description: TAMPERING OR FABRICATING WITH PHYSICAL EVIDENC; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.147.1-B; Charge Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 843.02; Charge Description: RESISTING ARREST WITHOUT VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER; Judge: TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less