This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 10/24/2020 at 11:03:17 (UTC).

STATE VS JATSKO MICHAEL ADAM

Case Summary

On 09/26/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JATSKO MICHAEL ADAM. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JEFFREY MAHL, AARON J PEACOCK and THOMAS JAMES BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JEFFREY MAHL

AARON J PEACOCK

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

JATSKO MICHAEL ADAM DOC Number - E40271

Melbourne, FL 32901-2508

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

10/21/2020: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

ORDER SETTING BOND

09/27/2020: ORDER SETTING BOND

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

09/27/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

09/27/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

09/27/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

09/26/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: AARON J PEACOCK; Matter Type: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Result: CR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SETTING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.07.2.B; Charge Description: BATTERY OF LEO OR FIREFIGHTER; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Disposition Date: 10/21/2020; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.07.2.B; Charge Description: BATTERY OF LEO OR FIREFIGHTER; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER CRIMES AGAINST PERSON; Judge: JEFFREY MAHL; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less