This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/28/2020 at 06:05:56 (UTC).

STATE VS HOULE BRIANNA LEE

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HOULE BRIANNA LEE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

HOULE BRIANNA LEE

Melbourne, FL 32901-4732

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

01/28/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

WAIVER OF COUNSEL

01/28/2020: WAIVER OF COUNSEL

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

01/28/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

01/28/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/31/2019: CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

12/20/2019: COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

12/19/2019: PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

12/19/2019: INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

SWORN COMPLAINT (SOUTH JURISDICTION)

12/19/2019: SWORN COMPLAINT (SOUTH JURISDICTION)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TF CO; Amount Assessed: $10.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CO RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CTY CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PREP & RECORD SAT CO; Amount Assessed: $25.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $25.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CERT & RECD ORDER CO; Amount Assessed: $13.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $13.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: ADDL COURT FUND CO; Amount Assessed: $65.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: BREV POLICE TEST CO; Amount Assessed: $3.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCR/TR SUMMONS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • WarrantWarrants/Writs: Name: HOULE BRIANNA LEE; Role: PARTY; Writ Number: 1689611; Writ Type: CRIMINAL SUMMONS; Amount: $0.00; Date Served: 12/30/2019; Issued To: ISSUED TO BREVARD CO SHERIFF; Type of Service: PERSONAL SERVICE; Service: SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCR/TR SUMMONS ISSD TO SHERIFF; Amount: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.2E; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT PROP OVER 100 LESS THAN 300; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SWORN COMPLAINT (SOUTH JURISDICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.2E; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT PROP OVER 100 LESS THAN 300; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 01/28/2020; Final Disposition: ADJUDICATION WITHHELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.2E; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT PROP OVER 100 LESS THAN 300; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less