This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/02/2020 at 06:50:39 (UTC).

STATE VS HORNICK CHAD MITCHELL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HORNICK CHAD MITCHELL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID DUGAN, TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU, KENNETH FRIEDLAND and THOMAS JAMES BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVID DUGAN

TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendants

HORNICK CHAD MITCHELL

Titusville, FL 32796-2629

HORNICK CHAD MITCHELL DOC Number - 930700

Titusville, FL 32796-2629

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

PYLES KORY ANDREW

5575 Us Highway 1

Rockledge, FL 32955-5624

LEAVITT JOSEPH DOUGLAS

400 South St

Titusville, FL 32780-7683

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

02/17/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT VIOLATION OF PROBATION (VOP) HEARING

02/17/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT VIOLATION OF PROBATION (VOP) HEARING

ADMISSION OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION (VOP) OR COMMUNITY CONTROL (VOCC)

02/17/2020: ADMISSION OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION (VOP) OR COMMUNITY CONTROL (VOCC)

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/10/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

01/10/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

01/10/2020: ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

01/10/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

01/10/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

01/10/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

12/19/2019: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

12/19/2019: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

COURT MINUTES REGARDING PLEA

12/19/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING PLEA

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

11/29/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

11/29/2019: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

11/29/2019: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

11/29/2019: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

11/29/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

11/29/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CIR; Amount Assessed: $200.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CIR; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE CIR; Amount Assessed: $100.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TR CIR; Amount Assessed: $25.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CIR RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CIR CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COI BREV SHERIFF CIR; Amount Assessed: $648.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $648.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: POL ACAD/LEEF COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $6.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: POL ACAD/LEEF CIR; Amount Assessed: $14.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $14.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PREP & RECORD SAT CI; Amount Assessed: $25.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $25.50

    Read MoreRead Less
220 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 7; Count: 8; Florida Statute: 810.02.4.B-D; Charge Description: BURGLARY OF A CONVEYANCE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 4; Count: 7; Florida Statute: 812.014.3.A-AA; Charge Description: PETIT THEFT LESS THAN 100 DOLLARS 1ST OFFENSE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 7; Count: 6; Florida Statute: 810.02.4.B-D; Charge Description: BURGLARY OF A CONVEYANCE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 7; Count: 5; Florida Statute: 810.02.4.B-D; Charge Description: BURGLARY OF A CONVEYANCE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 7; Count: 4; Florida Statute: 810.02.4.B-D; Charge Description: BURGLARY OF A CONVEYANCE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 7; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 810.02.4.B-D; Charge Description: BURGLARY OF A CONVEYANCE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 812.014.3.A-AA; Charge Description: PETIT THEFT LESS THAN 100 DOLLARS 1ST OFFENSE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 7; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.02.4.B-D; Charge Description: BURGLARY OF A CONVEYANCE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: BURGLARY; Judge: TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less