This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 10:02:46 (UTC).

STATE VS HONEYCUTT ANTHONY S

Case Summary

On 09/26/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HONEYCUTT ANTHONY S. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JEFFREY MAHL, AARON J PEACOCK, THOMAS JAMES BROWN and KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JEFFREY MAHL

AARON J PEACOCK

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendants

HONEYCUTT ANTHONY S

Melbourne, FL 32935-4304

HONEYCUTT ANTHONY SCOTT

Melbourne, FL 32935-4304

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/30/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

09/30/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

INFORMATION

09/30/2020: INFORMATION

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

09/27/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

09/27/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

09/27/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

09/27/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

09/27/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF BOND CORRECTION

09/26/2020: NOTICE OF BOND CORRECTION

NOTICE OF BOND CORRECTION

09/26/2020: NOTICE OF BOND CORRECTION

COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

09/26/2020: COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

09/26/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 08:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:EARLY RESOLUTION; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: KELLY INGRAM; User: cat66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCAL:EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 893.13.6A-56; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: NO ACTION; Prosecutor Action Date: 09/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A-AAA; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 09/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.13.6A-56; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 09/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF BOND CORRECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DRUGS; Judge: JEFFREY MAHL; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 893.13.6A-56; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Disposition Date: 09/30/2020; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A-AAA; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.13.6A-56; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A-BE; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE SUBOXONE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.13.6A-56; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.13.6A-56; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less