This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 10/24/2020 at 11:01:40 (UTC).

STATE VS HEATH MIKAELA ANN

Case Summary

On 09/26/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HEATH MIKAELA ANN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JEFFREY MAHL, AARON J PEACOCK, THOMAS JAMES BROWN and KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JEFFREY MAHL

AARON J PEACOCK

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

HEATH MIKAELA ANN

Cocoa, FL 32922-6744

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/23/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

10/22/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

10/22/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

10/22/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

10/22/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

INFORMATION

10/05/2020: INFORMATION

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

09/28/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

09/28/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

09/27/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

09/26/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 08:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:EARLY RESOLUTION; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: KELLY INGRAM; User: kih68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCAL:EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: AARON J PEACOCK; Matter Type: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Result: CR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A-AAA; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.13.6A-AF; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF BUPRENORPHINE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • BondBonds: Bond Id: 657754; Count Id: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Number: AA20657932; Amount: $2,000.00; Status: OPEN; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • DocketBOND POSTED- (Count 1); Amount: 2000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DRUGS; Judge: JEFFREY MAHL; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less