This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/10/2021 at 00:11:52 (UTC).

STATE VS HAYNES HANSOM SHAMAR

Case Summary

On 02/21/2021 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HAYNES HANSOM SHAMAR. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KELLY JO MCKIBBEN, TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU and KENNETH FRIEDLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KELLY JO MCKIBBEN

TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

HAYNES HANSOM SHAMAR

Titusville, FL 32780-4630

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

04/08/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

04/08/2021: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

04/08/2021: COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

03/03/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

INFORMATION

03/03/2021: INFORMATION

SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

02/23/2021: SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

02/21/2021: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

02/23/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/21/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

02/21/2021: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

02/21/2021: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

02/21/2021: ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

02/21/2021: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/22/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

02/21/2021: CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

02/21/2021: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 08:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:EARLY RESOLUTION; Court Room Description: TITUSVILLE HISTORIC COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; User: cas78

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCAL:EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Matter Type: EARLY RESOLUTION; Result: CR: EARLY RESOLUTION CONT DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCR: EARLY RESOLUTION CONT DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCAL:EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER CRIMES AGAINST PERSON; Judge: TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2021
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 316.1935.3-C; Charge Description: FLEE OR ATT TO ELUDE HIGH SPEED PURSUIT; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Citation Number: 2021A3IN5OP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2021
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 316.1935.3-AA; Charge Description: AGGRAVATED FLEEING AND ELUDING; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2021
  • DocketCitations: Agency: TITUSVILLE POLICE DEPT; Officer: GONZALEZ MATTHEW- Badge 214; Citation Number: 2021A3IN5OP; Vehicle State: FL; Vehicle License: HDBJ56; Body Type: 4 DOOR; Make: CHEV; Color: SV; Year: 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant