Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/25/2020 at 11:21:24 (UTC).

STATE VS HASH KEVIN RANDALL

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HASH KEVIN RANDALL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JEFFREY MAHL, DAVID C KOENIG, RHONDA E. BABB and DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JEFFREY MAHL

DAVID C KOENIG

RHONDA E. BABB

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

HASH KEVIN RANDALL DOC Number - E27876

Melbourne, FL 32904-8208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL 5TH

7165 Murrell Rd Ste 101

Melbourne, FL 32940-8261

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

03/05/2020: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

COURT MINUTES REGARDING RELEASE HEARING

03/04/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING RELEASE HEARING

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

02/04/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

02/03/2020: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/03/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/31/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

01/31/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

01/31/2020: ORDER APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

01/31/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

01/31/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

01/31/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

01/31/2020: COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

01/31/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketWAV: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:15 PM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: RELEASE HEARING; Result: CR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 1; Transaction Type: RECORD ORDER/CREATE BOND; Transaction Amount: $0.00; Transaction Balance: $0.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: OPEN; Check Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • BondBonds: Bond Id: 647158; Count Id: 1; Bond Type: RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE; Bond Number: 647158; Amount: $0.00; Status: RELEASED; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketBOND POSTED- (Count 1); Amount: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Docket(#15) RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE (ROR) BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) COURT MINUTES REGARDING RELEASE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: BURGLARY; Judge: JEFFREY MAHL; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less