This case was last updated from Brevard County - Eighteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/02/2022 at 11:06:36 (UTC).

STATE VS HARRIS KENNETH C

Case Summary

On 05/14/2022 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HARRIS KENNETH C. This case was filed in Brevard County - Eighteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHELLE A BAKER and KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MICHELLE A BAKER

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

HARRIS KENNETH CHARLES

Vero Beach, FL 32962-6201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

05/14/2022: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:15 PM; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Matter Type: OUT OF COUNTY WARRANT; Result: CR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Docket(#5) COURT MINUTES REGARDING OUT OF COUNTY WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDISPO: EXTRADITION- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketPLEA: NONE- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCAL:OUT OF COUNTY WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:15 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: OUT OF COUNTY WARRANT; Result: CR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Docket(#3) COURT MINUTES REGARDING OUT OF COUNTY WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Docket(#2) ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCAL:OUT OF COUNTY WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 901.04; Charge Description: OUT OF COUNTY ARREST; Class: NOT APPLICABLE; Degree: NOT APPLICABLE; Disposition Date: 05/23/2022; Final Disposition: EXTRADITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 901.04; Charge Description: OUT OF COUNTY ARREST; Class: NOT APPLICABLE; Degree: NOT APPLICABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant