This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/29/2020 at 09:21:51 (UTC).

STATE VS HARPER DAVID ROBERT

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HARPER DAVID ROBERT. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KATHRYN C JACOBUS, KENNETH FRIEDLAND and TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KATHRYN C JACOBUS

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

HARPER DAVID ROBERT DOC Number - D70600

Titusville, FL 32780-3330

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

LEAVITT JOSEPH DOUGLAS

400 South St

Titusville, FL 32780-7683

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

04/27/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/23/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

04/15/2020: RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

04/07/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

03/26/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

02/28/2020: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/28/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

02/28/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

02/28/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

SERVED CAPIAS

02/28/2020: SERVED CAPIAS

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

02/27/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

CAPIAS

02/26/2020: CAPIAS

MOTION FOR CAPIAS

02/24/2020: MOTION FOR CAPIAS

CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED

01/17/2020: CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED

COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

11/26/2019: COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

11/25/2019: PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

11/25/2019: INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

SWORN COMPLAINT (NORTH JURISDICTION)

11/25/2019: SWORN COMPLAINT (NORTH JURISDICTION)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PUB DEF/APPT CNSL CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: RESTITUTION; Amount Assessed: $56.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $56.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TF CO; Amount Assessed: $10.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CO RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COI TITUSVILLE CO; Amount Assessed: $43.13; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $43.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CTY CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCR/TR SUMMONS UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • WarrantWarrants/Writs: Name: HARPER DAVID ROBERT; Role: PARTY; Writ Number: 1688922; Writ Type: CRIMINAL SUMMONS; Amount: $0.00; Date Served: 01/16/2020; Issued To: ISSUED TO BREVARD CO SHERIFF; Type of Service: PERSONAL SERVICE; Service: UNSERVED; Unserved Reason: UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCR/TR SUMMONS ISSD TO SHERIFF; Amount: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.3.A; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT LESS THAN 300 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SWORN COMPLAINT (NORTH JURISDICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.3.A; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT LESS THAN 300 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.3.A; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT LESS THAN 300 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Disposition Date: 04/27/2020; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less