This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/09/2020 at 09:08:27 (UTC).

STATE VS GUNN JOHN PATRICK

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GUNN JOHN PATRICK. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID C KOENIG, DAVID E. SILVERMAN and BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVID C KOENIG

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

GUNN JOHN PATRICK

Malabar, FL 32950-4402

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION

03/11/2020: JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

03/11/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

03/11/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

03/11/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

03/06/2020: RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

SURETY BOND- (Count 4)

01/23/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 4)

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/21/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

01/21/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

01/21/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

01/21/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

01/21/2020: ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

01/20/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

BENCH WARRANT

01/16/2020: BENCH WARRANT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

01/16/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/13/2019: CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

11/25/2019: COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

11/25/2019: INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

SWORN COMPLAINT (CENTRAL JURISDICTION)

11/25/2019: SWORN COMPLAINT (CENTRAL JURISDICTION)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COI BREV SHERIFF CO; Amount Assessed: $192.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $192.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PUB DEF/APPT CNSL CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TF CO; Amount Assessed: $10.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CO RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CTY CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: POL ACAD/LEEF COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $6.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCR/TR SUMMONS ISSD TO SHERIFF; Amount: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SWORN COMPLAINT (CENTRAL JURISDICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 810.09.1; Charge Description: TRESPASS ON PROPERTY NOT STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 03/11/2020; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 810.09.1; Charge Description: TRESPASS ON PROPERTY NOT STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 810.09.1; Charge Description: TRESPASS ON PROPERTY NOT STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 03/11/2020; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 810.09.1; Charge Description: TRESPASS ON PROPERTY NOT STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.09.1; Charge Description: TRESPASS ON PROPERTY NOT STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 03/11/2020; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.09.1; Charge Description: TRESPASS ON PROPERTY NOT STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less