This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 10/10/2020 at 10:00:57 (UTC).

STATE VS GRICE CHRISTOPHER L

Case Summary

On 09/26/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GRICE CHRISTOPHER L. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KELLY JO MCKIBBEN, AARON J PEACOCK and THOMAS JAMES BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KELLY JO MCKIBBEN

AARON J PEACOCK

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

GRICE CHRISTOPHER LOWELL

Cape Canaveral, FL 32920-2645

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

10/01/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/30/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

09/26/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

09/26/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

09/26/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

09/26/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

09/26/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

09/26/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: AARON J PEACOCK; Matter Type: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Result: CR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2020
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DRUGS; Judge: KELLY JO MCKIBBEN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 893.147.1-A; Charge Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A; Charge Description: POSSESS OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE W OUT PRESCRIPTION; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 893.147.1-A; Charge Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A; Charge Description: POSSESS OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE W OUT PRESCRIPTION; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 741.29.6; Charge Description: PRETRIAL RELEASE COND VIOLATION FOR ORIG DV ARREST; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 741.29.6; Charge Description: PRETRIAL RELEASE COND VIOLATION FOR ORIG DV ARREST; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less