This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 10/24/2020 at 11:03:09 (UTC).

STATE VS GRAY ANTWON WALTER

Case Summary

On 09/26/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GRAY ANTWON WALTER. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KELLY JO MCKIBBEN, AARON J PEACOCK and THOMAS JAMES BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KELLY JO MCKIBBEN

AARON J PEACOCK

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

GRAY ANTWON WALTER DOC Number - E24177

Melbourne, FL 32901-7177

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

WAGNER MARGARET KENDRA

1900 S Harbor City Blvd Ste 124

Melbourne, FL 32901-4902

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) FOR DOCKET SOUNDING

10/20/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) FOR DOCKET SOUNDING

INFORMATION

10/20/2020: INFORMATION

NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK HABITUAL OFFENDER STATUS PENALTIES

10/20/2020: NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK HABITUAL OFFENDER STATUS PENALTIES

MOTION TO WITHDRAW COUNSEL

10/09/2020: MOTION TO WITHDRAW COUNSEL

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

09/27/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

09/27/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

09/27/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

09/26/2020: COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

09/26/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 01:30 PM; Event Description: CAL:DOCKET SOUNDING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: KELLY JO MCKIBBEN; User: lmr62

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 8; Florida Statute: 893.13.6B; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF LESS THAN 20 GRAMS OF CANNABIS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: NO ACTION; Prosecutor Action Date: 10/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 7; Florida Statute: 893.13.1.A.2-AC; Charge Description: POSS OF CLONAZEPAM WITH INTENT TO SELL OR DEL; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: NO ACTION; Prosecutor Action Date: 10/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 6; Florida Statute: 790.07.1-A; Charge Description: CARRYING WEAPON DURING A CRIMINAL OFFENSE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: NO ACTION; Prosecutor Action Date: 10/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 5; Florida Statute: 790.01.2; Charge Description: CARRYING A CONCEALED FIREARM; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 10/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 4; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A-1; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF COCAINE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 10/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.135.1C.1-A; Charge Description: TRAFFICKING IN ILLEGAL DRUGS 4 TO 14 GRAMS; Class: FELONY; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.135.1F.1; Charge Description: TRAF AMPHETAMINE OR METHAMPHETAMINE 14 TO 28 GRAMS; Class: FELONY; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 8; Florida Statute: 893.13.6B; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF LESS THAN 20 GRAMS OF CANNABIS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 7; Florida Statute: 790.01.2; Charge Description: CARRYING A CONCEALED FIREARM; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 6; Florida Statute: 790.07.1-A; Charge Description: CARRYING WEAPON DURING A CRIMINAL OFFENSE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 5; Florida Statute: 790.23.1-D; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF FIREARM BY CONVICTED FELON; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 4; Florida Statute: 893.13.1.A.2-AC; Charge Description: POSS OF CLONAZEPAM WITH INTENT TO SELL OR DEL; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 893.13.1.A.1; Charge Description: POSS OF COCAINE WITH INTENT TO SELL OR DELIVER; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.135.1.C.1.B-E; Charge Description: TRAFFICKING ILLEGAL DRUGS W FIREARM 14 TO 28 GRAMS; Class: FELONY; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.135.1.C.1.A-1; Charge Description: ARMED TRAFFICKING IN HEROIN 4 TO 14 GRAMS; Class: FELONY; Degree: LIFE

    Read MoreRead Less