This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/26/2020 at 09:31:27 (UTC).

STATE VS GRANT ELIAS JAI

Case Summary

On 11/24/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GRANT ELIAS JAI. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KELLY JO MCKIBBEN, THOMAS JAMES BROWN and JUDITH E ATKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KELLY JO MCKIBBEN

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

JUDITH E ATKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

GRANT ELIAS JAI

Palm Bay, FL 32907-9424

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

COPY OF CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION- (Count 7)

03/27/2020: COPY OF CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION- (Count 7)

COPY OF CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION- (Count 4)

03/27/2020: COPY OF CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION- (Count 4)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

03/25/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

COURT MINUTES REGARDING HEARING

02/24/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING HEARING

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

02/18/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/14/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

02/12/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN AS PREVIOUSLY SET

02/12/2020: ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN AS PREVIOUSLY SET

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/06/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

01/14/2020: RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/02/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

E-CITATION (CITATION ELECTRONICALLY FILED BY LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY)- (Count 2)

12/03/2019: E-CITATION (CITATION ELECTRONICALLY FILED BY LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY)- (Count 2)

E-CITATION (CITATION ELECTRONICALLY FILED BY LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY)- (Count 2)

12/03/2019: E-CITATION (CITATION ELECTRONICALLY FILED BY LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY)- (Count 2)

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

11/25/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

11/25/2019: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

11/25/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF BOND CORRECTION

11/24/2019: NOTICE OF BOND CORRECTION

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

11/24/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 09:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:DOCKET SOUNDING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: KELLY JO MCKIBBEN; User: mss63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: KELLY JO MCKIBBEN; Matter Type: DOCKET SOUNDING; Result: CR: DCKT SNDNG CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketCR: DCKT SNDNG CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 9; Florida Statute: 843.02; Charge Description: RESISTING ARREST WITHOUT VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: NO ACTION; Prosecutor Action Date: 03/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 8; Florida Statute: 316.1935.4.A; Charge Description: AGG FLEE ELUDE ACCIDENT W INJURY OR PROP DAMAGE; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: NO ACTION; Prosecutor Action Date: 03/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 7; Florida Statute: 316.192.3.C.1-A; Charge Description: RECKLESS DRIVING W PROP DAMAGE OR PERSONAL INJURY; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 03/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 6; Florida Statute: 316.061.1-B; Charge Description: LEAVE SCENE CRASH PROP DAMAGE ATTENDED VEH OVER 50; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 03/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 843.02-C; Charge Description: RESISTING OFFICER OBSTRUCT WITHOUT VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 316.1935.4.B; Charge Description: FLEE OR ELUDE OFFICER WITH PROPERTY DAMAGE; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCitations: Agency: PALM BAY POLICE DEPT; Officer: MOORE GREG- Badge 196; Citation Number: 2019ACR2LSE; Vehicle State: FL; Vehicle License: 9805YF; Body Type: 4 DOOR; Make: INFIN; Color: GY; Year: 2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCitations: Agency: PALM BAY POLICE DEPT; Officer: MOORE GREG- Badge 196; Citation Number: 2019ACR2LRE; Vehicle State: FL; Vehicle License: 9805YF; Body Type: 4 DOOR; Make: INFIN; Color: GY; Year: 2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCitations: Agency: PALM BAY POLICE DEPT; Officer: MOORE GREG- Badge 196; Citation Number: 2019ACR2LQE; Vehicle State: FL; Vehicle License: 9805YF; Body Type: 4 DOOR; Make: INFIN; Color: GY; Year: 2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCitations: Agency: PALM BAY POLICE DEPT; Officer: MOORE GREG- Badge 196; Citation Number: 2019ACR2LPE; Vehicle State: FL; Vehicle License: 9805YF; Body Type: 4 DOOR; Make: INFIN; Color: GY; Year: 2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCitations: Agency: PALM BAY POLICE DEPT; Officer: BALL STEPHEN- Badge 154; Citation Number: 2019ACR2LOE; Vehicle State: FL; Vehicle License: 9605YF; Body Type: 4 DOOR; Make: INFIN; Color: GY; Year: 2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCitations: Agency: PALM BAY POLICE DEPT; Officer: BALL STEPHEN- Badge 154; Citation Number: 2019ACR2LNE; Vehicle State: FL; Vehicle License: 9805YF; Body Type: 4 DOOR; Make: INFIN; Color: GY; Year: 2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCitations: Agency: MELBOURNE POLICE DEPT; Officer: PEREZ- Badge 4208; Citation Number: 2019ACEYFIE; Vehicle State: FL; Vehicle License: 9805YF; Body Type: 4 DOOR; Make: INFIN; Color: GY; Year: 2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCitations: Agency: MELBOURNE POLICE DEPT; Officer: PEREZ- Badge 4208; Citation Number: 2019ACEYFHE

    Read MoreRead Less