This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/10/2020 at 11:31:54 (UTC).

STATE VS GRAHAM ROBERT L

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GRAHAM ROBERT L. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS JAMES BROWN and RHONDA E. BABB. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

RHONDA E. BABB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

GRAHAM ROBERT LORRAINE

Cocoa Beach, FL 32931-2195

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

KONTOS JAMES G

5430 Village Dr Ste 103

Rockledge, FL 32955-6583

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

02/16/2020: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

02/05/2020: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/05/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

02/01/2020: PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/31/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

01/31/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

01/31/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

01/31/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket(#7) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 18-21-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:15 PM; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Matter Type: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Result: CR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SETTING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.03.1.A.1; Charge Description: BATTERY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 02/16/2020; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.03.1.A.1; Charge Description: BATTERY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less