This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/06/2020 at 08:26:32 (UTC).

STATE VS GORHAM ISHA EARL

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GORHAM ISHA EARL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KELLY JO MCKIBBEN, THOMAS JAMES BROWN and JUDITH E ATKIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KELLY JO MCKIBBEN

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

JUDITH E ATKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

GORHAM ISHA EARL

Tavares, FL 32778-5903

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

12/20/2019: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

COURT INFORMATION SHEET

12/06/2019: COURT INFORMATION SHEET

CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION- (Count 2)

12/06/2019: CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION- (Count 2)

SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

12/02/2019: SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

12/02/2019: SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

11/26/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

11/26/2019: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

11/26/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

11/25/2019: CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

11/25/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketREMOVAL OF ACCDNT TRANSMITTED- (Count 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketDHSMV DISPOSITION TRANSMITTED- (Count 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE ISSD- (Count 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE ISSD- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketWAV: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - NON-INDIGENT(CIRCUIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 316.061.1-B; Charge Description: LEAVE SCENE CRASH PROP DAMAGE ATTENDED VEH OVER 50; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Disposition Date: 12/20/2019; Final Disposition: DISMISSED; Citation Number: 2019ABVME7E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.045.1A.1-E; Charge Description: AGGRAVATED BATTERY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Disposition Date: 12/20/2019; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 316.061.1-B; Charge Description: LEAVE SCENE CRASH PROP DAMAGE ATTENDED VEH OVER 50; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.045.1A.1-E; Charge Description: AGGRAVATED BATTERY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER CRIMES AGAINST PERSON; Judge: KELLY JO MCKIBBEN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCitations: Agency: WEST MELBOURNE POLICE DEPT; Officer: MATHIS JACOB- Badge 712; Citation Number: 2019ABVME7E; Vehicle State: FL; Vehicle License: 999PIX; Body Type: 2 DOOR; Make: HOND; Color: BK; Year: 2018

    Read MoreRead Less