This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/01/2020 at 14:26:57 (UTC).

STATE VS GHETIYA JAYANTILAL T

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GHETIYA JAYANTILAL T. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID C KOENIG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID C KOENIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

GHETIYA JAYANTILAL T DOC Number - E57722

Melbourne, FL 32901-7716

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorneys

MCCARTHY BRYAN

2715 N Harbor City Blvd Ste 4

Melbourne, FL 32935-6255

GERMAIN MARK S

2715 N Harbor City Blvd Ste 4

Melbourne, FL 32935-6255

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

06/25/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

06/25/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

PLEA IN ABSENTIA

06/25/2020: PLEA IN ABSENTIA

ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN AS PREVIOUSLY SET

06/25/2020: ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN AS PREVIOUSLY SET

COURT MINUTES REGARDING PLEA

06/25/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING PLEA

COURT MINUTES REGARDING PLEA

06/25/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING PLEA

PLEA IN ABSENTIA

06/19/2020: PLEA IN ABSENTIA

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/19/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

06/08/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

CONSENT SCHEDULING ORDER

06/08/2020: CONSENT SCHEDULING ORDER

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

04/16/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

03/09/2020: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

02/24/2020: RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/19/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

02/19/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

INFORMATION

02/07/2020: INFORMATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/05/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

02/05/2020: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TF CO; Amount Assessed: $10.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CO RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CTY CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COI WEST MELB CO; Amount Assessed: $123.90; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $123.90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PREP & RECORD SAT CO; Amount Assessed: $25.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $25.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CERT & RECD ORDER CO; Amount Assessed: $13.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $13.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: ADDL COURT FUND CO; Amount Assessed: $65.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.2.E-E; Charge Description: PETIT THEFT PROPERTY MORE THAN 100 LESS THAN 750; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 02/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: DAVID C KOENIG; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.2.E-E; Charge Description: PETIT THEFT PROPERTY MORE THAN 100 LESS THAN 750; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.2.E-E; Charge Description: PETIT THEFT PROPERTY MORE THAN 100 LESS THAN 750; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 06/25/2020; Final Disposition: ADJUDICATION WITHHELD

    Read MoreRead Less