This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/26/2020 at 08:50:44 (UTC).

STATE VS GARDNER SAMANTHA R

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GARDNER SAMANTHA R. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID C KOENIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID C KOENIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

GARDNER SAMANTHA RENATE DOC Number - E49540

Merritt Island, FL 32953-4670

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

04/14/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

04/01/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

03/11/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

03/11/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

03/06/2020: RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

02/26/2020: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

COURT MINUTES REGARDING JURY TRIAL

02/26/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING JURY TRIAL

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

02/13/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

01/16/2020: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/16/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

01/16/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

01/16/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

01/16/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/12/2019: CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

11/25/2019: COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

11/25/2019: PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

11/25/2019: INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

SWORN COMPLAINT (CENTRAL JURISDICTION)

11/25/2019: SWORN COMPLAINT (CENTRAL JURISDICTION)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 01:30 PM; Event Description: CAL:PLEA; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: DAVID C KOENIG; User: caf90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCAL:PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID C KOENIG; Matter Type: PLEA; Result: CR: PLEA CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketCR: PLEA CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketCAL:PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID C KOENIG; Matter Type: PLEA; Result: CR: PLEA CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketCR: PLEA CONT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketCAL:PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCR/TR SUMMONS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 806.13.1.B.2-B; Charge Description: CRIMINAL MISCHIEF OVER 200 LESS THAN 1000 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • WarrantWarrants/Writs: Name: GARDNER SAMANTHA RENATE; Role: PARTY; Writ Number: 1688882; Writ Type: CRIMINAL SUMMONS; Amount: $0.00; Date Served: 12/10/2019; Issued To: ISSUED TO BREVARD CO SHERIFF; Type of Service: PERSONAL SERVICE; Service: SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCR/TR SUMMONS ISSD TO SHERIFF; Amount: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SWORN COMPLAINT (CENTRAL JURISDICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 806.13.1.B.2-B; Charge Description: CRIMINAL MISCHIEF OVER 200 LESS THAN 1000 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 806.13.1.B.2-B; Charge Description: CRIMINAL MISCHIEF OVER 200 LESS THAN 1000 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less