This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/27/2020 at 06:06:06 (UTC).

STATE VS GAGE PETER DENNIS

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GAGE PETER DENNIS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS JAMES BROWN, JUDITH E ATKIN and KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

JUDITH E ATKIN

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

GAGE PETER DENNIS DOC Number - E57262

Cocoa, FL 32922-6530

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

AMENDED ORDER FOR FINE, COSTS, AND FEES

12/18/2019: AMENDED ORDER FOR FINE, COSTS, AND FEES

AMENDED MINUTES

12/18/2019: AMENDED MINUTES

AMENDED MINUTES

12/16/2019: AMENDED MINUTES

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

12/16/2019: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION

12/16/2019: JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

12/16/2019: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

12/16/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

12/11/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN AS PREVIOUSLY SET

12/11/2019: ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN AS PREVIOUSLY SET

ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

12/11/2019: ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

INFORMATION

12/11/2019: INFORMATION

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

12/11/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

11/26/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

11/26/2019: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

11/26/2019: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

11/26/2019: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

11/26/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

11/25/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PUB DEF/APPT CNSL CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TF CO; Amount Assessed: $10.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CO RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COI BREV SHERIFF CO; Amount Assessed: $123.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $123.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CTY CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: POL ACAD/LEEF COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $2.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CO- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT(COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.08.2.B; Charge Description: TRESPASS IN OCCUPIED STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 12/16/2019; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.09.2.B-A; Charge Description: TRESPASS FAIL LEAVE PROPERTY UPON WARNING BY OWNER; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less