This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/17/2020 at 15:17:29 (UTC).

STATE VS FLORES NOVELLA LOUISA

Case Summary

On 01/01/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FLORES NOVELLA LOUISA. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID E. SILVERMAN, TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU and KENNETH FRIEDLAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

FLORES NOVELLA LOUISA

Titusville, FL 32780-4611

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL 5TH

7165 Murrell Rd Ste 101

Melbourne, FL 32940-8261

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

01/28/2020: NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

01/13/2020: RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FAVORABLE TO DEFENDANT

01/07/2020: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FAVORABLE TO DEFENDANT

SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

01/06/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

01/08/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

01/07/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/07/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/02/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

01/02/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

01/02/2020: ORDER APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

01/02/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

01/02/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

01/02/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

01/01/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE ISSD- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketWAV: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $50.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 1; Transaction Type: RECORD ORDER/CREATE BOND; Transaction Amount: $20,000.00; Transaction Balance: $0.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: RELEASED; Check Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT (CIRCUIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: BURGLARY; Judge: TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.02.2.A-AA; Charge Description: BURGLARY WITH ASSAULT OR BATTERY; Class: FELONY; Degree: FIRST DEG PUNISHABLE BY LIFE; Disposition Date: 01/28/2020; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.02.2.A-AA; Charge Description: BURGLARY WITH ASSAULT OR BATTERY; Class: FELONY; Degree: FIRST DEG PUNISHABLE BY LIFE

    Read MoreRead Less