This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/18/2020 at 19:22:52 (UTC).

STATE VS FIELDS JUSTIN LOYAL

Case Summary

On 10/14/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FIELDS JUSTIN LOYAL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBIN C LEMONIDIS, KELLY INGRAM, THOMAS JAMES BROWN and JAMES H EARP. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBIN C LEMONIDIS

KELLY INGRAM

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

JAMES H EARP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

FIELDS JUSTIN LOYAL

Palm Bay, FL 32907-1022

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

MEISTER TAMARA

Mcs Courier

Melbourne, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

03/10/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

COURT MINUTES REGARDING JURY TRIAL

03/10/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING JURY TRIAL

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

02/13/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/11/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

02/11/2020: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/17/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

01/17/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

01/12/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

12/27/2019: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/17/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

11/19/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

11/19/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

INFORMATION

11/05/2019: INFORMATION

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

10/23/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

SURETY BOND- (Count 4)

10/15/2019: SURETY BOND- (Count 4)

SURETY BOND- (Count 3)

10/15/2019: SURETY BOND- (Count 3)

SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

10/15/2019: SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

10/14/2019: COST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/04/2024
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2024
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CIR; Amount Assessed: $200.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2024
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CIR; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2024
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE CIR; Amount Assessed: $100.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2024
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PUB DEF/APPT CNSL CI; Amount Assessed: $100.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2024
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TR CIR; Amount Assessed: $25.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2024
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CIR RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2024
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CIR CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2024
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COI BREV SHERIFF CIR; Amount Assessed: $72.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $72.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2024
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: POL ACAD/LEEF CIR; Amount Assessed: $6.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
156 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 5; Florida Statute: 812.019.1; Charge Description: DEALING OR TRAFFICKING IN STOLEN PROPERTY; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Disposition Date: 03/10/2020; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 4; Florida Statute: 812.014.3.A; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT LESS THAN 300 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Disposition Date: 03/10/2020; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 810.02.3.B-H; Charge Description: BURGLARY OF DWELLING; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Disposition Date: 03/10/2020; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 812.019.2; Charge Description: ORGANIZE PLAN THEFT TRAFFIC STOLEN PROPERTY; Class: FELONY; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 11/05/2019; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 539.001.8B.8A; Charge Description: FALSE VERIFICATION OWNERSHIP TO PAWNBROKER LESS300; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Disposition Date: 03/10/2020; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 5; Florida Statute: 812.019.1; Charge Description: DEALING OR TRAFFICKING IN STOLEN PROPERTY; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 4; Florida Statute: 812.014.3.A; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT LESS THAN 300 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 810.02.3.B-H; Charge Description: BURGLARY OF DWELLING; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 812.019.2; Charge Description: ORGANIZE PLAN THEFT TRAFFIC STOLEN PROPERTY; Class: FELONY; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 539.001.8B.8B; Charge Description: FALSE VRFCTN OWNERSHIP TO PAWNBROKER MORE THAN 300; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less