This case was last updated from Brevard County - Eighteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/14/2022 at 09:40:50 (UTC).

STATE VS FATA ANTONIO S

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FATA ANTONIO S. This case was filed in Brevard County - Eighteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID C KOENIG, MICHELLE A BAKER and KATHRYN C JACOBUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVID C KOENIG

KATHRYN C JACOBUS

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

FATA ANTONIO SEBASTIAN

Windermere, FL 34786-6406

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

BIGNEY DAVID ROBERT

203 E Livingston St

Orlando, FL 32801-1508

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ARREST WARRANT

07/13/2022: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ARREST WARRANT

WARRANT FOR ARREST

07/13/2022: WARRANT FOR ARREST

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/19/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

07/19/2022: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

07/19/2022: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

07/20/2022: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

SERVED ARREST WARRANT

07/20/2022: SERVED ARREST WARRANT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

07/21/2022: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT OUT OF COUNTY

07/21/2022: ARREST AFFIDAVIT OUT OF COUNTY

SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

07/25/2022: SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

OUT OF COUNTY MISCELLANEOUS PAPERWORK

07/21/2022: OUT OF COUNTY MISCELLANEOUS PAPERWORK

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 18-21-B

07/25/2022: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 18-21-B

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: KATHRYN C JACOBUS; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 1; Transaction Type: RECORD ORDER/CREATE BOND; Transaction Amount: $10,000.00; Transaction Balance: $0.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: OPEN; Check Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 18-21-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:15 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Result: CR: HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • BondBonds: Bond Id: 695410; Count Id: 1; Bond Type: SURETY BOND; Bond Number: 2022BB012784; Amount: $10,000.00; Status: OPEN; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketBOND POSTED- (Count 1); Amount: 10000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) OUT OF COUNTY MISCELLANEOUS PAPERWORK

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • WarrantWarrants/Writs: Name: FATA ANTONIO SEBASTIAN; Role: PARTY; Writ Number: 1711763; Writ Type: ARREST WARRANT; Amount: $0.00; Date Served: 07/20/2022; Issued To: ISSUED TO BREVARD CO SHERIFF; Type of Service: PERSONAL SERVICE; Release: NO RELEASE HOLD FOR JUDGE; Service: SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSD TO SHERIFF; Amount: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WARRANT FOR ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ARREST WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER CRIMES AGAINST PERSON; Judge: DAVID C KOENIG; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 2; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.041.3; Charge Description: FELONY BATTERY OR DOMESTIC BATT BY STRANGULATION; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 2; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.041.3; Charge Description: FELONY BATTERY OR DOMESTIC BATT BY STRANGULATION; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant