This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/17/2020 at 07:12:53 (UTC).

STATE VS EMERICK SAMANTHA T

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against EMERICK SAMANTHA T. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH FRIEDLAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendants

EMERICK SAMANTHA TYLER DOC Number - E47265

Titusville, FL 32780-3330

EMERICK SAMANTHA TYLAR DOC Number - E47265

Titusville, FL 32780-3330

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

WAIVER OF COUNSEL

01/16/2020: WAIVER OF COUNSEL

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

01/16/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

01/16/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/19/2019: CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

11/26/2019: COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

11/25/2019: PROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

11/25/2019: INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

SWORN COMPLAINT (NORTH JURISDICTION)

11/25/2019: SWORN COMPLAINT (NORTH JURISDICTION)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: RESTITUTION; Amount Assessed: $56.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $56.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TF CO; Amount Assessed: $10.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CO RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COI TITUSVILLE CO; Amount Assessed: $43.13; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $43.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CTY CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: POL ACAD/LEEF COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $2.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PREP & RECORD SAT CO; Amount Assessed: $25.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $25.50

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • WarrantWarrants/Writs: Name: EMERICK SAMANTHA TYLAR; Role: PARTY; Writ Number: 1688923; Writ Type: CRIMINAL SUMMONS; Amount: $0.00; Date Served: 12/18/2019; Issued To: ISSUED TO BREVARD CO SHERIFF; Type of Service: PERSONAL SERVICE; Service: SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCR/TR SUMMONS ISSD TO SHERIFF; Amount: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.3.A; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT LESS THAN 300 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED CRIMINAL OR TRAFFIC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY THE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SWORN COMPLAINT (NORTH JURISDICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.3.A; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT LESS THAN 300 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE; Disposition Date: 01/16/2020; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 812.014.3.A; Charge Description: EXP 09 19 PETIT THEFT LESS THAN 300 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less