This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 10/24/2020 at 11:01:57 (UTC).

STATE VS EDWARDS CHRISTOPHER L

Case Summary

On 09/26/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against EDWARDS CHRISTOPHER L. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KELLY JO MCKIBBEN, AARON J PEACOCK and THOMAS JAMES BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KELLY JO MCKIBBEN

AARON J PEACOCK

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

EDWARDS CHRISTOPHER LEE DOC Number - E12737

Bonifay, FL 32425-4238

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL 5TH

7165 Murrell Rd Ste 101

Melbourne, FL 32940-8261

 

Court Documents

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

10/22/2020: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

10/22/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

10/22/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

10/22/2020: ORDER APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

10/22/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

INFORMATION

10/06/2020: INFORMATION

WAIVER OF COUNSEL

09/27/2020: WAIVER OF COUNSEL

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

09/27/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

09/27/2020: ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

09/27/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

09/27/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

09/26/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 01:30 PM; Event Description: CAL:DOCKET SOUNDING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: KELLY JO MCKIBBEN; User: kih68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER APPOINTING REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 800.09.2; Charge Description: LEWD OR LASCIVIOUS EXHIBITION PRESENCE OF EMPLOYEE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 800.09.2; Charge Description: LEWD OR LASCIVIOUS EXHIBITION PRESENCE OF EMPLOYEE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SEXUAL OFFENSES; Judge: KELLY JO MCKIBBEN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less