This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 10/18/2020 at 10:06:31 (UTC).

STATE VS DUBLIN EDWIN WALDO

Case Summary

On 09/26/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DUBLIN EDWIN WALDO. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are AARON J PEACOCK, TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU and MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

AARON J PEACOCK

TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

DUBLIN EDWIN WALDO

Titusville, FL 32780-7703

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

SURETY BOND- (Count 6)

10/05/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 6)

SURETY BOND- (Count 4)

10/05/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 4)

SURETY BOND- (Count 3)

10/05/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 3)

SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

10/05/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

10/05/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

10/02/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/01/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

09/28/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

09/28/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN AS PREVIOUSLY SET

09/28/2020: ORDER FOR CASE TO REMAIN AS PREVIOUSLY SET

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

09/27/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

09/27/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

09/27/2020: ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

09/28/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

09/27/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

09/26/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 1; Transaction Type: RECORD ORDER/CREATE BOND; Transaction Amount: $1,000.00; Transaction Balance: $0.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: OPEN; Check Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 1; Transaction Type: RECORD ORDER/CREATE BOND; Transaction Amount: $5,000.00; Transaction Balance: $0.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: OPEN; Check Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 1; Transaction Type: RECORD ORDER/CREATE BOND; Transaction Amount: $5,000.00; Transaction Balance: $0.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: OPEN; Check Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 1; Transaction Type: RECORD ORDER/CREATE BOND; Transaction Amount: $5,000.00; Transaction Balance: $0.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: OPEN; Check Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 1; Transaction Type: RECORD ORDER/CREATE BOND; Transaction Amount: $2,000.00; Transaction Balance: $0.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: OPEN; Check Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SURETY BOND- (Count 6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SURETY BOND- (Count 4)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 784.07.2.B; Charge Description: BATTERY OF LEO OR FIREFIGHTER; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.03-C; Charge Description: BATTERY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 6; Florida Statute: 806.13.1.B.2-B; Charge Description: CRIMINAL MISCHIEF OVER 200 LESS THAN 1000 DOLLARS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 5; Florida Statute: 784.07.2.B; Charge Description: BATTERY OF LEO OR FIREFIGHTER; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 4; Florida Statute: 784.07.2.B; Charge Description: BATTERY OF LEO OR FIREFIGHTER; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 784.07.2.B; Charge Description: BATTERY OF LEO OR FIREFIGHTER; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 784.07.2.B; Charge Description: BATTERY OF LEO OR FIREFIGHTER; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 784.03-C; Charge Description: BATTERY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER CRIMES AGAINST PERSON; Judge: TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less