This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/17/2020 at 08:01:22 (UTC).

STATE VS DIVOLL PHYLLIS ANN

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DIVOLL PHYLLIS ANN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JUDITH E ATKIN and KENNETH FRIEDLAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JUDITH E ATKIN

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

DIVOLL PHYLLIS ANN

Titusville, FL 32780-9999

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION

01/17/2020: JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION

ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

01/17/2020: ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES

COURT MINUTES REGARDING PLEA

01/17/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING PLEA

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/08/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

01/08/2020: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

01/08/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

01/06/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

01/06/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING

RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

12/14/2019: RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

INFORMATION

12/10/2019: INFORMATION

PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

12/02/2019: PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

11/26/2019: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

11/26/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

11/26/2019: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

11/26/2019: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

11/26/2019: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

11/26/2019: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

11/25/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIM JUST W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COP PROSECUTE COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CRIMES CO W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PUB DEF/APPT CNSL CO; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: STATE GEN CLK TF CO; Amount Assessed: $10.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CO RECORDING ADD PG; Amount Assessed: $8.50; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: COI TITUSVILLE CO; Amount Assessed: $60.96; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $60.96

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: CTY CRIM CPY PER PG; Amount Assessed: $1.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: POL ACAD/LEEF COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $2.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CO- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketPLEA: NOT GUILTY- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT(COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.09.1; Charge Description: TRESPASS ON PROPERTY NOT STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 01/17/2020; Final Disposition: GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.08.1-B; Charge Description: TRESPASS IN STRUCT OR CONVEYANCE AFTER WARNING; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MISDEMEANOR; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less