This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/30/2020 at 00:19:56 (UTC).

STATE VS DEWALD DENNIS EUGENE

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DEWALD DENNIS EUGENE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KELLY INGRAM, TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU, DAVID E. SILVERMAN, KENNETH FRIEDLAND and JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KELLY INGRAM

TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

CITY OF TITUSVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT

1100 Usa Boulevard

Titusville, FL 32780

Defendant

DEWALD DENNIS EUGENE

Titusville, FL 32780-5244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING EXPERT AND SETTING HEARING

07/25/2020: ORDER APPOINTING EXPERT AND SETTING HEARING

ORDER SETTING BOND

07/17/2020: ORDER SETTING BOND

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

07/17/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PRESENT CHILD VICTIM HEARSAY

06/23/2020: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PRESENT CHILD VICTIM HEARSAY

RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

06/23/2020: RESPONSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND NOTICE TO CLAIM ALIBI

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) FOR DOCKET SOUNDING

06/18/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) FOR DOCKET SOUNDING

INFORMATION

06/18/2020: INFORMATION

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

06/18/2020: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

SEARCH WARRANT RETURN

03/17/2020: SEARCH WARRANT RETURN

SEARCH WARRANT AFFIDAVIT

03/17/2020: SEARCH WARRANT AFFIDAVIT

SEARCH WARRANT

03/17/2020: SEARCH WARRANT

RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE (ROR) BOND

03/04/2020: RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE (ROR) BOND

COURT MINUTES REGARDING RELEASE HEARING

03/04/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING RELEASE HEARING

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

02/06/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/04/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/01/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

02/01/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

01/31/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 08:30 AM; Event Description: CAL:DOCKET SOUNDING; Court Room Description: TITUSVILLE HISTORIC COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU; User: atk61

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCAL:DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 09:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:HEARING; Court Room Description: TITUSVILLE HISTORIC COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU; User: lmr62

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER APPOINTING EXPERT AND SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION TO DETERMINE DEFENDANTS COMPETENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU; Matter Type: DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR.; Matter Type: DOCKET SOUNDING; Result: CR: DCKT SNDNG CONT BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 2; Transaction Type: BOND REFUND; Transaction Amount: $0.00; Transaction Balance: $0.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: REVOKE; Check Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 2; Transaction Type: BOND REFUND; Transaction Amount: $0.00; Transaction Balance: $0.00; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: REVOKE; Check Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 10; Florida Statute: 800.04.5.B-B; Charge Description: LEWD LASC MOLESTATION VIC UNDER 12 OFFENDER OVER18; Class: FELONY; Degree: LIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 9; Florida Statute: 800.04.5.B-B; Charge Description: LEWD LASC MOLESTATION VIC UNDER 12 OFFENDER OVER18; Class: FELONY; Degree: LIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 8; Florida Statute: 800.04.5.B-B; Charge Description: LEWD LASC MOLESTATION VIC UNDER 12 OFFENDER OVER18; Class: FELONY; Degree: LIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 7; Florida Statute: 800.04.5.B-B; Charge Description: LEWD LASC MOLESTATION VIC UNDER 12 OFFENDER OVER18; Class: FELONY; Degree: LIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 6; Florida Statute: 847.0133.1; Charge Description: DISTRIBUTE SHOW TRANSMIT OBSCENE MATERIAL TO MINOR; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 5; Florida Statute: 847.0133.1; Charge Description: DISTRIBUTE SHOW TRANSMIT OBSCENE MATERIAL TO MINOR; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 4; Florida Statute: 800.04.7.B; Charge Description: LEWD LASCIVIOUS EXH OFF OVER 18 CHILD LESS 16; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 800.04.7.B; Charge Description: LEWD LASCIVIOUS EXH OFF OVER 18 CHILD LESS 16; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 800.04.7.B; Charge Description: LEWD LASCIVIOUS EXH OFF OVER 18 CHILD LESS 16; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 800.04.7.B; Charge Description: LEWD LASCIVIOUS EXH OFF OVER 18 CHILD LESS 16; Class: FELONY; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less