This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/05/2020 at 03:09:28 (UTC).

STATE VS DECLEMENTI RALPH III

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DECLEMENTI RALPH III. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KELLY INGRAM, TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU and KENNETH FRIEDLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KELLY INGRAM

TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendants

DECLEMENTI RALPH

Cocoa, FL 32927-8947

DECLEMENTI RALPH III

Melbourne, FL 32901-1335

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

07/23/2020: RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

07/23/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

07/23/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

06/18/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

06/18/2020: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

06/18/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

04/20/2020: RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

04/08/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

03/30/2020: RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

03/19/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

03/19/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

02/06/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

02/06/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

02/01/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

02/01/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

02/01/2020: ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

02/01/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

01/31/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 08:30 AM; Event Description: CAL:EARLY RESOLUTION; Court Room Description: TITUSVILLE HISTORIC COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; User: atm87

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCAL:EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:30 AM; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Matter Type: EARLY RESOLUTION; Result: CR: EARLY RESOLUTION CONT CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) COURT MINUTES REGARDING EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCR: EARLY RESOLUTION CONT CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCAL:EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:30 AM; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Matter Type: EARLY RESOLUTION; Result: CR: EARLY RESOLUTION CONT DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - NON-INDIGENT(CIRCUIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.147.1-B; Charge Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.13.6A-56; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.147.1-A; Charge Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.13.2.A.1-1; Charge Description: ATTEMPTED PURCHASE OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DRUGS; Judge: TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less