This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/28/2020 at 11:06:08 (UTC).

STATE VS COLOM DESTANI MARIE

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against COLOM DESTANI MARIE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

COLOM DESTANI MARIE

Melbourne, FL 32940-8194

 

Court Documents

LETTER TO PARENTS REGARDING SMOKING CITATION

02/03/2020: LETTER TO PARENTS REGARDING SMOKING CITATION

SMOKING CITATION- (Count 1)

01/31/2020: SMOKING CITATION- (Count 1)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: TOBACCO 20% W/CLK CO; Amount Assessed: $5.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: ANTI TOBACCO FINE; Amount Assessed: $20.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: POL ACAD/LEEF COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $2.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: ADDL CT CLEAR COUNTY; Amount Assessed: $3.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDiversion Summary: Count: 1; Description: ANTI-TOBACCO CLASS; Hours: 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LETTER TO PARENTS REGARDING SMOKING CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketANTI-TOBACCO CLASS ORDERED- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketASM: ANTI TOBACCO FINE- (Count 1); Amount: 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketASM: ADDL CT CLEARING COUNTY- (Count 1); Amount: 3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketASM: POL ACAD/LEEF COUNTY- (Count 1); Amount: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketASM: TOBACCO 20% W/CLK COUNTY- (Count 1); Amount: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketELECTION PENDING- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMOKING CITATION- (Count 1); Amount: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 877.112.6.A; Charge Description: POSS NICOTINE PRODUCT OR DEVICE BY MINOR 1ST OFF; Class: INFRACTION; Degree: NOT APPLICABLE; Disposition Date: 01/31/2020; Final Disposition: ELECTION PENDING; Citation Number: 2020T000211

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 877.112.6.A; Charge Description: POSS NICOTINE PRODUCT OR DEVICE BY MINOR 1ST OFF; Class: INFRACTION; Degree: NOT APPLICABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCitations: Agency: SATELLITE BEACH POLICE DEPT; Officer: VALIENTE GRETTA- Badge 475; Citation Number: 2020T000211

    Read MoreRead Less