This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 10/18/2020 at 10:07:45 (UTC).

STATE VS CLAWSON JOHNATHAN C

Case Summary

On 09/26/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CLAWSON JOHNATHAN C. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHELLE A BAKER, AARON J PEACOCK and TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MICHELLE A BAKER

AARON J PEACOCK

TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

CLAWSON JOHNATHAN CORBIN

Cocoa, FL 32927-4834

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

INTERIM ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND STATES DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS INTENTION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

10/07/2020: INTERIM ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND STATES DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS INTENTION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

09/30/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

INFORMATION

09/30/2020: INFORMATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/30/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

09/28/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 2)

SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

09/28/2020: SURETY BOND- (Count 1)

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

09/26/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

09/26/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

09/26/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

09/26/2020: ORDER NO ACTION AS TO BOND, DEFENDANT REMANDED

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

09/26/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

09/26/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

09/26/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 08:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:EARLY RESOLUTION; Court Room Description: TITUSVILLE HISTORIC COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: MICHELLE A BAKER; User: tae70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCAL:EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) INTERIM ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND STATES DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS INTENTION TO ISSUE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.147.1-A; Charge Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: NO ACTION; Prosecutor Action Date: 09/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • ChargeProsecutor Charges; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.13.6A-56; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE; Prosecutor Action: FILED; Prosecutor Action Date: 09/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE ISSD- (Count 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) FOR EARLY RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • DocketASM: PD APP/INDG COST W/CLK CI- (Count 1); Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DRUGS; Judge: TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.147.1-A; Charge Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE; Disposition Date: 09/30/2020; Final Disposition: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.13.6A-56; Charge Description: POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 893.147.1-A; Charge Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 893.13.6.A; Charge Description: POSSESS OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE W OUT PRESCRIPTION; Class: FELONY; Degree: THIRD DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less