This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 10/24/2020 at 11:04:11 (UTC).

STATE VS CAVANAUGH PHILLIP F

Case Summary

On 09/26/2020 STATE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CAVANAUGH PHILLIP F. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are NANCY MALONEY, AARON J PEACOCK, THOMAS JAMES BROWN and KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

NANCY MALONEY

AARON J PEACOCK

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant

CAVANAUGH PHILLIP FRANCES

Cape Canaveral, FL 32920-3048

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVARD CO STATE ATTORNEY

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg D

Viera, FL 32940-6605

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

2725 Judge Fran Jamieson Way Bldg E

Viera, FL 32940-6605

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/23/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

10/22/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

10/22/2020: ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

10/22/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

10/22/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

WAIVER OF COUNSEL

09/27/2020: WAIVER OF COUNSEL

NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

09/27/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

09/27/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER

COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

09/27/2020: COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

09/26/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 08:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:ARRAIGNMENT; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: KELLY INGRAM; User: kih68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCAL:ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancials: Name: D 1; Receivable: PD APP/INDG W/CLK CI; Amount Assessed: $50.00; Amount Waived: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:00 AM; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Matter Type: ARRAIGNMENT; Result: CR: ARRAIGNMENT CONT BY STATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCR: ARRAIGNMENT CONT BY STATE

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketCR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketCAL:INITIAL APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: BURGLARY; Judge: NANCY MALONEY; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 806.13.1.B.1; Charge Description: CRIMINAL MISCHIEF 200 OR LESS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 784.03.1.A.1; Charge Description: BATTERY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeCourt Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.02.2.A-I; Charge Description: BURGLARY OF A DWELLING WITH AN ASSAULT OR BATTERY; Class: FELONY; Degree: FIRST DEG PUNISHABLE BY LIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 3; Florida Statute: 806.13.1.B.1; Charge Description: CRIMINAL MISCHIEF 200 OR LESS; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 2; Florida Statute: 784.03.1.A.1; Charge Description: BATTERY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Class: MISDEMEANOR; Degree: FIRST DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeInitial Charges: Arrest Number: 1; Count: 1; Florida Statute: 810.02.2.A-I; Charge Description: BURGLARY OF A DWELLING WITH AN ASSAULT OR BATTERY; Class: FELONY; Degree: FIRST DEG PUNISHABLE BY LIFE

    Read MoreRead Less